THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:16:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Multi Specialty Clinic
21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 897-8928
Fax: (905) 897-9229

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehdi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mehdi (CPSO#: 83662 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(647) 267-3640
Business Address: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
(905) 897-9228

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Multi Specialty Clinic
21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 897-8928
Fax: (905) 897-9229

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehdi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mehdi (CPSO#: 83662 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(647) 267-3640
Business Address: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
(905) 897-9228

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADYA BADRUDDIN MEHDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADYA BADRUDDIN MEHDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2005