THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Cardiology
501Smyth Road
CCW 1682
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8165
Fax: (613) 739-6727

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadine Gauthier Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gauthier (CPSO#: 83671 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Cardiology
501 Smyth Road
CCW 1679
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8165

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Cardiology
501Smyth Road
CCW 1682
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8165
Fax: (613) 739-6727

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadine Gauthier Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gauthier (CPSO#: 83671 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Cardiology
501 Smyth Road
CCW 1679
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8165

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADINE MYLENE GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADINE MYLENE GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2005