THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:40:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057259922
Fax: 7057258622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chan (CPSO#: 83672 )
Business Address: 306-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
7057259922
Business Address: 106 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 725-9922

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057259922
Fax: 7057258622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chan (CPSO#: 83672 )
Business Address: 306-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
7057259922
Business Address: 106 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 725-9922

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA HOI YEE CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA HOI YEE CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2005