THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:45:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
AG31c-2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 89324
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yeung (CPSO#: 83681 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room AG31c
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 89324

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
AG31c-2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 89324
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yeung (CPSO#: 83681 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room AG31c
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 89324

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2005