THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:36:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Paris, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
11Th Floor
PMB Room 178
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 3451
Fax: (416) 340-5321
Address: St Michael's Hospital
30 bond Street
Toronto, On
M5B 1W8
Toronto Ontario M5M 2P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 585 University Ave
Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
9-MARS 9058
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 08 Sep 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Selzner-Malekkiani & M. Selzner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Selzner (CPSO#: 83694 ) Dr. N. Selzner-Malekkiani (CPSO#: 83701 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Surgery
11 PMB 178
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 5884

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Paris, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
11Th Floor
PMB Room 178
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 3451
Fax: (416) 340-5321
Address: St Michael's Hospital
30 bond Street
Toronto, On
M5B 1W8
Toronto Ontario M5M 2P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 585 University Ave
Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
9-MARS 9058
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 08 Sep 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Selzner-Malekkiani & M. Selzner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Selzner (CPSO#: 83694 ) Dr. N. Selzner-Malekkiani (CPSO#: 83701 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Surgery
11 PMB 178
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 5884

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Jun 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 24 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nazia Selzner-Malekkiani may practise medicine independently in
gastroenterology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nazia Selzner-Malekkiani may practise medicine independently in
gastroenterology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Paris, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2005