THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:43:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kyungpook National University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Haematology & Oncology
OPG Room 6-222
610 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-6541
Fax: (416) 946-4563

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 03 Mar 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Hematology
Effective: 03 Mar 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dong Hwan Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kim (CPSO#: 83716 )
Business Address: UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 6-222
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: Kyungpook National University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Haematology & Oncology
OPG Room 6-222
610 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-6541
Fax: (416) 946-4563

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 03 Mar 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Hematology
Effective: 03 Mar 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dong Hwan Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kim (CPSO#: 83716 )
Business Address: UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 6-222
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Jul 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 11 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Dong Hwan Kim may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Haematology/Medical Oncology, University of Toronto, in
which Dr. Kim holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Kim no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Dong Hwan Kim may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Haematology/Medical Oncology, University of Toronto, in
which Dr. Kim holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Kim no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kyungpook National University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2005