THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:16:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Connecticut, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cleveland Clinic Canada
181 Bay Street
Suite 3000
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: 416-507-6750
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave, Suite D674
Toronto Ontario M4N3M5
Phone: 416-480-4427
Fax: 416-480-4186
Address: 240 Duncan Mill Road
#404
Toronto Ontario M3B 3S6
Phone: 647-430-7191
Fax: 647-430-5343

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 12 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Sivjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sivjee (CPSO#: 83727 )
Business Address: 3000 - 181 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
(416) 507-6600
Business Address: D674 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4427

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Connecticut, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cleveland Clinic Canada
181 Bay Street
Suite 3000
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: 416-507-6750
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave, Suite D674
Toronto Ontario M4N3M5
Phone: 416-480-4427
Fax: 416-480-4186
Address: 240 Duncan Mill Road
#404
Toronto Ontario M3B 3S6
Phone: 647-430-7191
Fax: 647-430-5343

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 12 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Sivjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sivjee (CPSO#: 83727 )
Business Address: 3000 - 181 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
(416) 507-6600
Business Address: D674 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4427

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHALIL YUSUF SIVJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVJEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHALIL YUSUF SIVJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVJEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Connecticut, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2005