THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:30:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 230 Victoria St
Suite 229A
London ON N6A 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 601-7100
Fax: (519) 601-6525

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Mendonca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mendonca (CPSO#: 83728 )
Business Address: Suite 6
627 Maitland Street
London Ontario N5Y 2V7
(519) 601-7100
Business Address: 230 Victoria St
Suite 229A
London ON N6A 2C2
(519) 601-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 230 Victoria St
Suite 229A
London ON N6A 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 601-7100
Fax: (519) 601-6525

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Mendonca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mendonca (CPSO#: 83728 )
Business Address: Suite 6
627 Maitland Street
London Ontario N5Y 2V7
(519) 601-7100
Business Address: 230 Victoria St
Suite 229A
London ON N6A 2C2
(519) 601-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL ANIL MENDONCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDONCA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL ANIL MENDONCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDONCA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Oct 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2005