THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:30:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peel Memorial Family Medical Centre
169 Queen Street East
Suite 102
Brampton Ontario L6V 1B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-216-0663
Fax: 905-216-2865
Address: Unit #2026
3230 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 3P6
Phone: 647-749-9149
Fax: 416-238-8123

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhyat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bhyat (CPSO#: 83730 )
Business Address: 169 Queen Street East
Suite 102
Brampton Ontario L6V 1B3
(905) 216-0663
Business Address: Suite 2620
3320 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 2M4
(647) 749-9149

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peel Memorial Family Medical Centre
169 Queen Street East
Suite 102
Brampton Ontario L6V 1B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-216-0663
Fax: 905-216-2865
Address: Unit #2026
3230 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 3P6
Phone: 647-749-9149
Fax: 416-238-8123

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhyat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bhyat (CPSO#: 83730 )
Business Address: 169 Queen Street East
Suite 102
Brampton Ontario L6V 1B3
(905) 216-0663
Business Address: Suite 2620
3320 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 2M4
(647) 749-9149

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASHAAD BHYAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHYAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASHAAD BHYAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHYAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Oct 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2005