THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:23:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-222 Dixon Rd
Etobicoke ON M9P 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 850 8947
Fax: No Information Available
Address: C107-3885 Duke of York Blvd
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0E8
Phone: 905-366-4441
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2540 POSTMASTER DR
Oakville Ontario L6M 0E2
Phone: 905 847 5437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yasser Mansour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Mansour (CPSO#: 83763 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-222 Dixon Rd
Etobicoke ON M9P 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 850 8947
Fax: No Information Available
Address: C107-3885 Duke of York Blvd
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0E8
Phone: 905-366-4441
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2540 POSTMASTER DR
Oakville Ontario L6M 0E2
Phone: 905 847 5437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yasser Mansour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Mansour (CPSO#: 83763 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASSER MOHAMED ALY MANSOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSOUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASSER MOHAMED ALY MANSOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSOUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2005