THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:23:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clarity Eye Institute
9135 Keele St
Unit A5
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Extension: 225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kwesi McGuire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. McGuire (CPSO#: 83766 )
Business Address: Unit A5
9135 Keele Street
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clarity Eye Institute
9135 Keele St
Unit A5
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Extension: 225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kwesi McGuire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. McGuire (CPSO#: 83766 )
Business Address: Unit A5
9135 Keele Street
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KWESI CHIDI MCGUIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGUIRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KWESI CHIDI MCGUIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGUIRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2005