THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 102
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137322164
Fax: 6137322158

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Malcolm Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chang (CPSO#: 83772 )
Business Address: 102-201 Deacon Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 2J6
(613) 732-2164

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 102
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137322164
Fax: 6137322158

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Malcolm Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chang (CPSO#: 83772 )
Business Address: 102-201 Deacon Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 2J6
(613) 732-2164

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALCOLM ELLIOTT CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALCOLM ELLIOTT CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Dec 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2005