THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Cardiology
Room E222
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6043
Fax: (416) 480-6715

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaheeda M. Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed (CPSO#: 83773 )
Business Address: Division of Cardiology
Sunnybrook & Women's College HSC
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room E222
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6043

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Cardiology
Room E222
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6043
Fax: (416) 480-6715

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaheeda M. Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed (CPSO#: 83773 )
Business Address: Division of Cardiology
Sunnybrook & Women's College HSC
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room E222
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6043

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHEEDA MOSHFEQA AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHEEDA MOSHFEQA AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2005
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2005