THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:59:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3640 Wells st
windsor on
N9C1T9
Windsor Ontario N9C 4H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)258 0484
Fax: 519 258 0488
Address: Maryvale
3640 Wells Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 1T9
Phone: (519) 258-0484
Fax: (519) 258-0488

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Oct 2005
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tak (CPSO#: 83790 )
Business Address: Maryvale
3640 Wells Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 1T9
(519) 258-0484
Business Address: 3901 Connaught Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 4H4
(519) 257-5215

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3640 Wells st
windsor on
N9C1T9
Windsor Ontario N9C 4H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)258 0484
Fax: 519 258 0488
Address: Maryvale
3640 Wells Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 1T9
Phone: (519) 258-0484
Fax: (519) 258-0488

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Oct 2005
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tak (CPSO#: 83790 )
Business Address: Maryvale
3640 Wells Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 1T9
(519) 258-0484
Business Address: 3901 Connaught Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 4H4
(519) 257-5215

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARZANA YOUSUF TAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARZANA YOUSUF TAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Nov 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2006

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2005