THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:56:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital Metropolitan Campus
Radiology
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AM Beaudet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Beaudet (CPSO#: 83795 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
519-254-5577
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital Metropolitan Campus
Radiology
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AM Beaudet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Beaudet (CPSO#: 83795 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
519-254-5577
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE-MARIE LOUISE BEAUDET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUDET is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE-MARIE LOUISE BEAUDET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUDET is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Nov 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 May 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2005