THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:31:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The University of Tennessee, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3630 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1G 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416901385
Fax: 6476893546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 28 May 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdelrazek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abdelrazek (CPSO#: 83798 )
Business Address: 210 - 1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
(416) 289-2287

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The University of Tennessee, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3630 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1G 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416901385
Fax: 6476893546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 28 May 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdelrazek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abdelrazek (CPSO#: 83798 )
Business Address: 210 - 1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
(416) 289-2287

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NERMEAN MAHMOUD ABDELRAZEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELRAZEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NERMEAN MAHMOUD ABDELRAZEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELRAZEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The University of Tennessee, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2005