THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:42:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, SLOVAK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Extension: 3248
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 370 Bayview Drive
Unit 118
Barrie Ontario L4N 0M7
Phone: 7057285560
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1460 Major MacKenzie Drive West N3
Maple Ontario L6A4H6
Phone: 9053036010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: York Medical
17730 Leslie St.
Newmarket
Newmarket Ontario L3Y3E4
Phone: 9058530404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Podhradsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Podhradsky (CPSO#: 83815 )
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201

Corporation Name: Podhradsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 May 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, SLOVAK
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Extension: 3248
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 370 Bayview Drive
Unit 118
Barrie Ontario L4N 0M7
Phone: 7057285560
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1460 Major MacKenzie Drive West N3
Maple Ontario L6A4H6
Phone: 9053036010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: York Medical
17730 Leslie St.
Newmarket
Newmarket Ontario L3Y3E4
Phone: 9058530404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Podhradsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Podhradsky (CPSO#: 83815 )
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201

Corporation Name: Podhradsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 May 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUDEK PODHRADSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PODHRADSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUDEK PODHRADSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PODHRADSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Charles Univ Prague, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee. Effective: 07 May 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 May 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Quality Assurance Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2005