THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:00:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Natal, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304 - 679 Davis Dr
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 953-0410
Fax: (905) 953-9233

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Juta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Juta (CPSO#: 83835 )
Business Address: 304 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
(905) 953-0410

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Natal, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304 - 679 Davis Dr
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 953-0410
Fax: (905) 953-9233

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Juta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Juta (CPSO#: 83835 )
Business Address: 304 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
(905) 953-0410

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNIL JUTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNIL JUTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Natal, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2005
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2005