THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:52:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Elite Care Clinics
110 - 250 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor Ontario N8X 2R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 971-2901
Fax: (519) 971-2902
Address: 2710 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3X5
Phone: (519) 915-2101
Fax: (519) 971-2902

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 May 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ahmad Chaker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chaker (CPSO#: 83846 )
Business Address: 2710 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3X5
(519) 915-2101
Business Address: Elite Care Clinics
110-250Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8X 2R3
(519) 971-2901

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Elite Care Clinics
110 - 250 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor Ontario N8X 2R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 971-2901
Fax: (519) 971-2902
Address: 2710 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3X5
Phone: (519) 915-2101
Fax: (519) 971-2902

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 May 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ahmad Chaker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chaker (CPSO#: 83846 )
Business Address: 2710 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3X5
(519) 915-2101
Business Address: Elite Care Clinics
110-250Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8X 2R3
(519) 971-2901

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD MOHAMMAD AMEEN CHAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD MOHAMMAD AMEEN CHAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 28 Mar 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 28 Mar 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2005