THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:57:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-1100 Burloak Dr
Burlington ON L7L 6B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416.777.9933
Fax: 289.203.1178

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Mackie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mackie (CPSO#: 83849 )
Business Address: 300-1100 Burloak Dr
Burlington ON L7L 6B2
416.777.9933

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-1100 Burloak Dr
Burlington ON L7L 6B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416.777.9933
Fax: 289.203.1178

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Mackie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mackie (CPSO#: 83849 )
Business Address: 300-1100 Burloak Dr
Burlington ON L7L 6B2
416.777.9933

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER OULTON MACKIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER OULTON MACKIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2005