THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:28:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bern, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre, T2-054
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4928
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Address: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Odette Cancer Centre, Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
T2-006
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: +1-416-480-4928
Fax: +1-416-480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Mar 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 May 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 13 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. U. Emmenegger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Emmenegger (CPSO#: 83857 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
T2-054 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4928

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Bern, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre, T2-054
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4928
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Address: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Odette Cancer Centre, Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
T2-006
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: +1-416-480-4928
Fax: +1-416-480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Mar 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 May 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 13 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. U. Emmenegger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Emmenegger (CPSO#: 83857 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
T2-054 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4928

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Mar 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 13 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Urban Josef Emmenegger may practise medicine independently in medical
oncology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Urban Josef Emmenegger may practise medicine independently in medical
oncology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bern, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2005