THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:38:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Kern Rd
North York ON M3B 1S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 19 Harwood Ave S
Ajax Ontario L1S 2B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Biochemistry
Effective: 04 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Biochemistry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nawara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nawara (CPSO#: 83858 )
Business Address: Suite 102
4651 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 3V4
(416) 292-7001
Business Address: Suite 2
320 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J1
Business Address: 1414 King Street East
Courtice Ontario L1E 3B4
(905) 743-0090
Business Address: 21 Kern Rd
North York ON M3B 1S9
Business Address: 21 Kern Rd
North York ON M3B 1S9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Kern Rd
North York ON M3B 1S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 19 Harwood Ave S
Ajax Ontario L1S 2B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Biochemistry
Effective: 04 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Biochemistry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nawara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nawara (CPSO#: 83858 )
Business Address: Suite 102
4651 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 3V4
(416) 292-7001
Business Address: Suite 2
320 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J1
Business Address: 1414 King Street East
Courtice Ontario L1E 3B4
(905) 743-0090
Business Address: 21 Kern Rd
North York ON M3B 1S9
Business Address: 21 Kern Rd
North York ON M3B 1S9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABIR NURI NAWARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAWARA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABIR NURI NAWARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAWARA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jan 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2005