THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:43:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Chittagong, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 302
310 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 743-2142
Extension: 105
Fax: (519) 585-1756
Address: 139/141 FATHER DAVID BAUER DRIVE
Waterloo Ontario N2L6N9
Phone: 519 783 2236
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nazneen Mirza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mirza (CPSO#: 83882 )
Business Address: 302 - 310 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2L3
(519) 743-2142

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: University of Chittagong, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 302
310 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 743-2142
Extension: 105
Fax: (519) 585-1756
Address: 139/141 FATHER DAVID BAUER DRIVE
Waterloo Ontario N2L6N9
Phone: 519 783 2236
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nazneen Mirza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mirza (CPSO#: 83882 )
Business Address: 302 - 310 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2L3
(519) 743-2142

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAZNEEN SULTANA MIRZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAZNEEN SULTANA MIRZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Chittagong, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2006