THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:58:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Harvester Family Practice
409-3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056323000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sadaf Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed (CPSO#: 83884 )
Business Address: Halton Family Health Center
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 592-3950
Business Address: 3155 Harvester Rd
halton family practice
family practice
suite 409
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
9056323000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of London, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Harvester Family Practice
409-3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056323000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sadaf Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed (CPSO#: 83884 )
Business Address: Halton Family Health Center
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 592-3950
Business Address: 3155 Harvester Rd
halton family practice
family practice
suite 409
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
9056323000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SADAF KHURSHID AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SADAF KHURSHID AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Mar 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2006