THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:54:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 4
110 Pertosa Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 454-8866
Fax: (905) 454-6652

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parampal S. Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sandhu (CPSO#: 83886 )
Business Address: 4 - 110 Pertosa Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 5E9
(905) 454-8866

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 4
110 Pertosa Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 454-8866
Fax: (905) 454-6652

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parampal S. Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sandhu (CPSO#: 83886 )
Business Address: 4 - 110 Pertosa Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 5E9
(905) 454-8866

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARAMPAL SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARAMPAL SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Mar 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2006