THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LMC Endocrinology Centers
Suite 2 B
1723 kipling avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 4E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 645-1035
Fax: (416) 645-1036

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khandwala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khandwala (CPSO#: 83892 )
Business Address: 2B - 1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 4E1
(416) 645-1035

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LMC Endocrinology Centers
Suite 2 B
1723 kipling avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 4E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 645-1035
Fax: (416) 645-1036

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khandwala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khandwala (CPSO#: 83892 )
Business Address: 2B - 1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 4E1
(416) 645-1035

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASNAIN KHANDWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANDWALA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASNAIN KHANDWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANDWALA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2005
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2005