THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:46:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Monash University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-6876
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Kung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kung (CPSO#: 83895 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Monash University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-6876
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Kung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kung (CPSO#: 83895 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH YI LEE KUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH YI LEE KUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Monash University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2006