THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:10:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 410 Highway 8
Supercare Medical Centre
Stoney Creek ON L8G 1G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-560-5537
Fax: 905-561-6018

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nurain Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 83900 )
Business Address: 68A Centennial Parkway North
Hamilton Ontario L8E 1H6
(905) 560-5537
Business Address: 410 Highway 8
Supercare Medical Centre
Stoney Creek ON L8G 1G2
905-560-5537

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 410 Highway 8
Supercare Medical Centre
Stoney Creek ON L8G 1G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-560-5537
Fax: 905-561-6018

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nurain Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 83900 )
Business Address: 68A Centennial Parkway North
Hamilton Ontario L8E 1H6
(905) 560-5537
Business Address: 410 Highway 8
Supercare Medical Centre
Stoney Creek ON L8G 1G2
905-560-5537

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NURAIN IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NURAIN IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2006