THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:18:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fujian Medical College, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-3551 Sheppard Ave E
myHealth Medical center
3B
Scarborough ON M1T 3K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-297-7888
Fax: 833-967-1886

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yi Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Liu (CPSO#: 83904 )
Business Address: 3551 Sheppard Ave E
Scarborough ON M1T 3K8
416-297-7888
Business Address: 2942 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2T4
(416) 756-2725

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Fujian Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-3551 Sheppard Ave E
myHealth Medical center
3B
Scarborough ON M1T 3K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-297-7888
Fax: 833-967-1886

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yi Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Liu (CPSO#: 83904 )
Business Address: 3551 Sheppard Ave E
Scarborough ON M1T 3K8
416-297-7888
Business Address: 2942 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2T4
(416) 756-2725

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YI LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YI LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fujian Medical College, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2006