THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:27:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal De Pernambuco, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Ave east
Suite # 502
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 748-8272
Fax: (647) 748-8273

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gustavo Azoubel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Azoubel (CPSO#: 83908 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 502
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
(647) 748-8272

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade Federal De Pernambuco, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Ave east
Suite # 502
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 748-8272
Fax: (647) 748-8273

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gustavo Azoubel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Azoubel (CPSO#: 83908 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 502
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
(647) 748-8272

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUSTAVO ALBERTO PAES AZOUBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZOUBEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUSTAVO ALBERTO PAES AZOUBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZOUBEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal De Pernambuco, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Feb 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2006