THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:40:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Pontificia Univ Catolica De Campinas, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill Ontario L3T4A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058891125
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4646 Dufferin St.
North York Ontario M3H5S4
Phone: 4165126407
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham
HOSPITAL: Shouldice Hospital Ltd.
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rubens Barbosa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Barbosa (CPSO#: 83909 )
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Pontificia Univ Catolica De Campinas, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill Ontario L3T4A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058891125
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4646 Dufferin St.
North York Ontario M3H5S4
Phone: 4165126407
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham
HOSPITAL: Shouldice Hospital Ltd.
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rubens Barbosa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Barbosa (CPSO#: 83909 )
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBENS FERNANDO HENRIQUES CESPE BARBOSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBOSA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBENS FERNANDO HENRIQUES CESPE BARBOSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBOSA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jul 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jul 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Training

Medical School: Pontificia Univ Catolica De Campinas, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2006