THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:39:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bucharest, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, BULGARIAN, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-3335 Dougall Ave
Windsor ON N9E 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192583478
Fax: 5199463435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elia Huidovici Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Huidovici (CPSO#: 83919 )
Business Address: Suite 202
3335 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9E 1S8
(519) 258-3478

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, BULGARIAN, ROMANIAN
Medical School: University of Bucharest, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-3335 Dougall Ave
Windsor ON N9E 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192583478
Fax: 5199463435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elia Huidovici Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Huidovici (CPSO#: 83919 )
Business Address: Suite 202
3335 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9E 1S8
(519) 258-3478

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIA HUIDOVICI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUIDOVICI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIA HUIDOVICI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUIDOVICI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bucharest, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2006