THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:24:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 727-7688
Fax: (705) 734-6284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khatami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Khatami (CPSO#: 83974 )
Business Address: 203 - 480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
(705) 727-7688

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 727-7688
Fax: (705) 734-6284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khatami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Khatami (CPSO#: 83974 )
Business Address: 203 - 480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
(705) 727-7688

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIAN KHATAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATAMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIAN KHATAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATAMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2006