THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:52:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: N.Testemitanu State Medical and Pharma, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 370 Eastbidge Bloulevard
Unit 4
Waterloo Ontario N2K4P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198850000
Fax: 5197250002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sofronova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sofronova (CPSO#: 83980 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN, RUSSIAN
Medical School: N.Testemitanu State Medical and Pharma, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 370 Eastbidge Bloulevard
Unit 4
Waterloo Ontario N2K4P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198850000
Fax: 5197250002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sofronova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sofronova (CPSO#: 83980 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIONORA PETROVNA SOFRONOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOFRONOVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIONORA PETROVNA SOFRONOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOFRONOVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: N.Testemitanu State Medical and Pharma, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2006