THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:30:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Cancer Centre
Division of Palliative Care
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 64315
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Slaven Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Slaven (CPSO#: 83987 )
Business Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre
Division of Palliative Care
699 Concession Street
Suite 3-16
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 387-9495

Corporation Name: Frederick Spencer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Cancer Centre
Division of Palliative Care
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 64315
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Slaven Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Slaven (CPSO#: 83987 )
Business Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre
Division of Palliative Care
699 Concession Street
Suite 3-16
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 387-9495

Corporation Name: Frederick Spencer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARISSA SLAVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLAVEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARISSA SLAVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLAVEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Jan 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2006