THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:07:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Fell Pavillion, 4th Floor, Room 435
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (437) 836-3158
Fax: (416) 792-0276
Address: WILLIAM OSLER HEALTH SYSTEM
BRAMPTON CIVIC HOSPITAL
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton, Ontario
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 57607
Fax: (905) 494-6475
Address: WILLIAM OSLER HEALTH SYSTEM
ETOBICOKE GENERAL HOSPITAL
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke, Ontario M9V 1R8
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3469
Fax: (416) 747-3344
Address: 366 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 2M8
Phone: (416) 728-2756
Fax: (416) 792-0276

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 29 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dodig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dodig (CPSO#: 83993 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3469
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
4th Floor Fell Pavilion
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5922
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Fell Pavillion, 4th Floor, Room 435
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (437) 836-3158
Fax: (416) 792-0276
Address: WILLIAM OSLER HEALTH SYSTEM
BRAMPTON CIVIC HOSPITAL
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton, Ontario
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 57607
Fax: (905) 494-6475
Address: WILLIAM OSLER HEALTH SYSTEM
ETOBICOKE GENERAL HOSPITAL
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke, Ontario M9V 1R8
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3469
Fax: (416) 747-3344
Address: 366 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 2M8
Phone: (416) 728-2756
Fax: (416) 792-0276

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 29 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dodig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dodig (CPSO#: 83993 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3469
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
4th Floor Fell Pavilion
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5922
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUBRAVKA M DODIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DODIG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUBRAVKA M DODIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DODIG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Feb 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2006