THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:42:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Medical Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 740-6856
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darren C. A. Barber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Barber (CPSO#: 84010 )
Business Address: Peterborough Medical Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 740-6856

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Medical Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 740-6856
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darren C. A. Barber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Barber (CPSO#: 84010 )
Business Address: Peterborough Medical Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 740-6856

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARREN CHARLES ARTHUR BARBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARREN CHARLES ARTHUR BARBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Feb 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2006