THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:07:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 6th Street
Chatham Ontario N7M 5K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194800440
Fax: 5194800441
Address: C/O Women and Children's
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave W
Chatham Ontario N7M5L9
Phone: 5193526400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 89 Norman Street
Bluewater Health
Mother Infant Child MIC
Sarnia Ontario N7T
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Extension: 5213
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut
Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manna Adegbite Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Adegbite (CPSO#: 84011 )
Business Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Address: 4 6th Street
Chatham Ontario N7M 4V1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 6th Street
Chatham Ontario N7M 5K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194800440
Fax: 5194800441
Address: C/O Women and Children's
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave W
Chatham Ontario N7M5L9
Phone: 5193526400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 89 Norman Street
Bluewater Health
Mother Infant Child MIC
Sarnia Ontario N7T
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Extension: 5213
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut
Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manna Adegbite Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Adegbite (CPSO#: 84011 )
Business Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Address: 4 6th Street
Chatham Ontario N7M 4V1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANNA ADEBIMPE ADEGBITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEGBITE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANNA ADEBIMPE ADEGBITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEGBITE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2006
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2006