THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:32:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Home Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 423-1111
Fax: (613) 423-1112

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Feb 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Beattie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Beattie (CPSO#: 84032 )
Business Address: 5 Home Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 0A5
(613) 423-1111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Home Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 423-1111
Fax: (613) 423-1112

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Feb 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Beattie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Beattie (CPSO#: 84032 )
Business Address: 5 Home Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 0A5
(613) 423-1111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ALLAN BEATTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEATTIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ALLAN BEATTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEATTIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2006