THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:29:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Erasmus University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital, Room B2-412
800 Commisioners Road E
PO Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6106
Fax: (519) 646-6213

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 27 Nov 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Netherlands

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: de Vrijer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. de Vrijer (CPSO#: 84045 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital, Room B2 -412
800 Commissioners Road East
P.O. Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 646-6106

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH
Medical School: Erasmus University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital, Room B2-412
800 Commisioners Road E
PO Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6106
Fax: (519) 646-6213

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 27 Nov 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Netherlands

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: de Vrijer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. de Vrijer (CPSO#: 84045 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital, Room B2 -412
800 Commissioners Road East
P.O. Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 646-6106

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Mar 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 11 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. BARBRA DE VRIJER may practise medicine independently in obstetrics and gynecology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. BARBRA DE VRIJER may practise medicine independently in obstetrics and gynecology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Erasmus University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Mar 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Jul 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2006