THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:52:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 570 Lacolle Way
Orleans Cardiopulmonary group
Orléans Ontario K4A 0N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 699-3376
Fax: (613) 841-6770
Address: Montfort Hospital
Department of Cardiology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Extension: 4634
Fax: (613) 748-4975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Accuro
1B-700 Industrial Avenue
Ottawa, ON
K1G 0Y9

Tel: (613) 738-1242
Fax: (613) 738-0562
Date Received: 24 Aug 2011

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roland Sabbagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sabbagh (CPSO#: 84050 )
Business Address: Merivale Clinic
1370 Clyde Avenue
Nepean Ontario K2G 3H8
(613) 727-1072
Business Address: 570 Lacolle Way
Ottawa Ontario K4A 0N9
(613) 830-8388 Extn: 322
Business Address: Department of Internal Medicine
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 570 Lacolle Way
Orleans Cardiopulmonary group
Orléans Ontario K4A 0N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 699-3376
Fax: (613) 841-6770
Address: Montfort Hospital
Department of Cardiology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Extension: 4634
Fax: (613) 748-4975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Accuro
1B-700 Industrial Avenue
Ottawa, ON
K1G 0Y9

Tel: (613) 738-1242
Fax: (613) 738-0562
Date Received: 24 Aug 2011

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roland Sabbagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sabbagh (CPSO#: 84050 )
Business Address: Merivale Clinic
1370 Clyde Avenue
Nepean Ontario K2G 3H8
(613) 727-1072
Business Address: 570 Lacolle Way
Ottawa Ontario K4A 0N9
(613) 830-8388 Extn: 322
Business Address: Department of Internal Medicine
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROLAND SABBAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABBAGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROLAND SABBAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABBAGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2006
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2006