THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:55:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr. F. Wigmore Regional Hospital
55 Diefenbaker Drive
Moose Jaw Saskatchewan S6J 1M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (306) 631-2328
Fax: (306) 691-5966
Address: Healthy Way Medical Diagnostic
Centre
105 - 1120 Finch Ave W
Toronto Ontario M3J 3H7
Phone: (416) 667-8498
Fax: (416) 667-0334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omar Rodwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Rodwan (CPSO#: 84063 )
Business Address: Healthy Way Medical Diagnostic Centre
105 - 1120 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3J 3H7
(416) 667-8498
Business Address: 1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6H 3M1
(416) 652-6101

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr. F. Wigmore Regional Hospital
55 Diefenbaker Drive
Moose Jaw Saskatchewan S6J 1M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (306) 631-2328
Fax: (306) 691-5966
Address: Healthy Way Medical Diagnostic
Centre
105 - 1120 Finch Ave W
Toronto Ontario M3J 3H7
Phone: (416) 667-8498
Fax: (416) 667-0334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omar Rodwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Rodwan (CPSO#: 84063 )
Business Address: Healthy Way Medical Diagnostic Centre
105 - 1120 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3J 3H7
(416) 667-8498
Business Address: 1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6H 3M1
(416) 652-6101

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR MOHAMED ABDALLA RODWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR MOHAMED ABDALLA RODWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Dec 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 May 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2006