THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:06:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Tucuman, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Multiple Sclerosis Clinic
501 Smyth Road
Box 606
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8532
Extension: 0
Fax: (613) 739-6631
Address: 401 Smyth Rd
CHEO
neurology
C1
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613 -737-600
Fax: 613-738-4879

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 22 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 22 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR CAROLINA RUSH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rush (CPSO#: 84064 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
6137985555 Extn: 74100

Corporation Name: Dr. Carolina Rush Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, SPANISH
Medical School: National University of Tucuman, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Multiple Sclerosis Clinic
501 Smyth Road
Box 606
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8532
Extension: 0
Fax: (613) 739-6631
Address: 401 Smyth Rd
CHEO
neurology
C1
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613 -737-600
Fax: 613-738-4879

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 22 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 22 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR CAROLINA RUSH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rush (CPSO#: 84064 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
6137985555 Extn: 74100

Corporation Name: Dr. Carolina Rush Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINA ANA ESTEFANIA RUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINA ANA ESTEFANIA RUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Tucuman, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2006