THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:12:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-1825 Provincial Rd
Windsor ON N8W 5V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192544511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 225-995 QUEEN ST EAST
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 2C3
Phone: 705 450 0100
Fax: 705 450 0102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 29 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sirajeddin Ben Musa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ben Musa (CPSO#: 84084 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-1825 Provincial Rd
Windsor ON N8W 5V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192544511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 225-995 QUEEN ST EAST
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 2C3
Phone: 705 450 0100
Fax: 705 450 0102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 29 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sirajeddin Ben Musa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ben Musa (CPSO#: 84084 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIRAJEDDIN AWAD BEN MUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN MUSA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIRAJEDDIN AWAD BEN MUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN MUSA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2006