THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:56:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 592-2272
Fax: (905) 336-9627

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hormuzshaw Jamshed Wania Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wania (CPSO#: 84097 )
Business Address: Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 592-2272

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 592-2272
Fax: (905) 336-9627

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hormuzshaw Jamshed Wania Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wania (CPSO#: 84097 )
Business Address: Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 592-2272

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Oct 2010
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 14 2010
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Hormuzshaw Jamshed Wania may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.










VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Hormuzshaw Jamshed Wania may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.










Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Oct 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2006