THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Clinical Neurological
Sciences
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-2981
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Hebb Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hebb (CPSO#: 84101 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 663-2981
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Clincial Neurological Sciences
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Clinical Neurological
Sciences
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-2981
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Hebb Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hebb (CPSO#: 84101 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 663-2981
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Clincial Neurological Sciences
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW OLDING HEBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEBB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW OLDING HEBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEBB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2006