THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:18:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
ER department
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-417-2000
Extension: 4506
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anik Rawji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rawji (CPSO#: 84109 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Emergency Department
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7199
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
ER Department
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, SPANISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
ER department
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-417-2000
Extension: 4506
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anik Rawji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rawji (CPSO#: 84109 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Emergency Department
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7199
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
ER Department
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIK RAWJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAWJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIK RAWJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAWJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2006
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2006