THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:56:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Natal, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Carling Avenue
Royal Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Apr 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ASIFJEHAN KHAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khan (CPSO#: 84118 )
Business Address: 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
6137226521

Corporation Name: Asifjehan Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Apr 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Natal, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Carling Avenue
Royal Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Apr 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ASIFJEHAN KHAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khan (CPSO#: 84118 )
Business Address: 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
6137226521

Corporation Name: Asifjehan Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Apr 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASIFJEHAN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASIFJEHAN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Natal, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2006
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2006