THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:30:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4th floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 88333
Fax: 6137388261
Address: 1194 Evans Ave.
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7Z4
Phone: (613) 521-0999
Fax: 6135210444
Address: LEAF Weight Management Clinic
1980 Ogilvie Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1J 9L3
Phone: 613-701-1222
Fax: 613-701-1223
Address: Diabetes clinic
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 Jul 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abujrad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abujrad (CPSO#: 84138 )
Business Address: 1980 Ogilvie Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 9L3
Business Address: 1194 Evans Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7Z4
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400 Extn: 88333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4th floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 88333
Fax: 6137388261
Address: 1194 Evans Ave.
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7Z4
Phone: (613) 521-0999
Fax: 6135210444
Address: LEAF Weight Management Clinic
1980 Ogilvie Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1J 9L3
Phone: 613-701-1222
Fax: 613-701-1223
Address: Diabetes clinic
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 Jul 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abujrad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abujrad (CPSO#: 84138 )
Business Address: 1980 Ogilvie Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 9L3
Business Address: 1194 Evans Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7Z4
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400 Extn: 88333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUSSEIN ABDURRAHMAN ABUJRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUJRAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUSSEIN ABDURRAHMAN ABUJRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUJRAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2006