THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:19:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Chiba Medical University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAPANESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room EN 9N 957
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4290
Fax: (416) 340-3660

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 28 Aug 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Japan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kazuhiro Yasufuku Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yasufuku (CPSO#: 84143 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-1500
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
9N-957 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4290
Business Address: Mount Sinai Horpital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 596-4200
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAPANESE
Medical School: Chiba Medical University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room EN 9N 957
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4290
Fax: (416) 340-3660

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 28 Aug 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Japan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kazuhiro Yasufuku Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yasufuku (CPSO#: 84143 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-1500
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
9N-957 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4290
Business Address: Mount Sinai Horpital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 596-4200
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Jul 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 12 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Kazuhiro Yasufuku may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
University of Toronto, in which Dr. Yasufuku holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Yasufuku
no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Kazuhiro Yasufuku may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
University of Toronto, in which Dr. Yasufuku holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Yasufuku
no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Chiba Medical University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2006